FUTURE OF GHANA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We facilitate volunteering opportunities and coordinate research campaigns, community forums and mentoring programmes for young people in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Croydon
- Ghana
Governance
- 31 July 2012: Standard registration
- WAM (Working name)
- WHAT ABOUT ME CAMPAIGN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bennard Owusu | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wilfred Fianko | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nike AWOYINKA | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN THOMPSON-ADDO | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.85k | £4.88k | £14.69k | £1.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18k | £17.85k | £12.32k | £750 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 June 2024 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 May 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN GHANA, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND OPPORTUNITIES AVAILABLE FOR CHILDREN LIVING IN GHANA. (2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN GHANA AND THE UK BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION. (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Future of Ghana
1-4 Kings Parade
Lower Coombe Street
CROYDON
CR0 1AA
- Phone:
- 073752585687
- Email:
- info@futureofghana.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window