MIDLAND FINE ARTS AND LANGUAGE ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MFALA is Open to everyone across the United Kingdom Specially in Midlands,Also MFALA is providing classes for children in subjects that are not taught at their school Eg. Mother-Tongue language and other languages, Culture and Heritage, Dance, Music, Musical Instruments, Art etc and support the children in a friendly and cultural environment taking account of their cultural and language needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 July 2012: Standard registration
- MFALA (Working name)
- MIDLAND FIND ARTS AND LANGUAGE ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALASUBRAMANIAM RASAKUMARAN | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Subashini Myooran | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veethivedangan Jayachandiran | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Balasingham Kathir | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
THAMOTHARAMPILLAI KAMALANATHAN | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.51k | £30.89k | £42.66k | £54.52k | £61.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.54k | £27.04k | £34.52k | £41.93k | £51.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/06/2012 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF THOSE LIVING IN THE MIDLANDS WHO ARE FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS BY PROVIDING SUPPLEMENTAL EDUCATIONAL CLASSES.
Area of benefit
THE MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Denville Close
BILSTON
West Midlands
WV14 6JW
- Phone:
- 0121 7691054
- Email:
- info@mfala.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window