Accounts and annual returns SCARS OF WAR FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1149562
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required