Accounts and annual returns ABODE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1148628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 07 April 2025 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 07 April 2025 428 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 02 February 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 05 November 2022 639 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required