Financial history UPTON FESTIVAL OF BLUES LIMITED

Charity number: 1148230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £249.62k £450 £0 £283.32k £406.91k
Total expenditure £261.61k £14.09k £7.72k £263.94k £328.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A