Financial history UNLIMITED CHURCH

Charity number: 1149371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £65.03k £43.89k £36.92k £30.53k £27.40k
Total expenditure £64.66k £43.18k £42.14k £30.75k £30.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £360
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A