Accounts and annual returns NEW VISUALITY

Charity number: 1148823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 13 November 2019 On Time Download Open in new window