Financial history NEW VISUALITY

Charity number: 1148823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £83.15k £57.79k £54.07k £76.89k £114.73k
Total expenditure £78.35k £54.73k £58.79k £81.87k £111.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £9.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.54k £3.80k £9.00k £14.00k £46.87k