Trustees BETHESDA FREE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1148620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Stephen Boreland Chair 28 June 2012
PROPHETIC WITNESS MOVEMENT INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
David Boreland Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Dr DIONYSIOS TRIGKILIDAS Trustee 20 December 2024
None on record
Daniel Sheraton Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record
ALAN BAITEY Trustee 28 June 2012
None on record
IAN CAMERON Trustee 28 June 2012
None on record
BRUCE WILLIS THOMPSON Elder Trustee 28 June 2003
None on record