Financial history LIVING FAITH CHURCH

Charity number: 1147718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £87.96k £48.41k £58.21k £59.95k £100.85k
Total expenditure £78.28k £47.65k £59.62k £57.33k £82.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £452 £730 £860
Income from government grants N/A £10.35k £1.50k £123 £6.35k