TENBURY NILS SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tenbury NILS (No Interest Loan Scheme) is a project which seeks to assist the most disadvantaged and vulnerable people living in our community. It offers interest free loans to people who would otherwise not be able to access commercial credit, for reasons of unemployment, benefit recipients or people who are in receipt of a low income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £130,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 March 2013: Standard registration
- 10 June 2017: Funds received from 251880 TENBURY WELFARE TRUST
- TENBURY NO INTEREST LOAN SCHEME (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Stevens | Chair | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Timlin | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Harrison-Stone | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark John Inglis | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.39k | £112.53k | £291.96k | £125.52k | £181.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.65k | £82.62k | £84.86k | £185.20k | £203.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £45.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £36.50k | N/A | £95.42k | £130.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE NO INTEREST LOANS AND GRANTS TO PEOPLE LIVING IN THE TOWN OF TENBURY WELLS AND IN THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE ASSESSED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRITERIA SET BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE IN ACUTE FINANCIAL NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o DHJH Tenbury Wells Llp
81 Teme Street
TENBURY WELLS
Worcestershire
WR15 8AE
- Phone:
- 07949 443641
- Email:
- enquiries@nils.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window