FOP FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOP Friends' aim is to further research into Fibrodysplasia Ossificans Progressiva (FOP) and related conditions by supporting current and future research projects together with supporting families impacted. Activities include supporting fundraisers, holding fund raising events, biennial conferences, family weekend and working with doctors and researcher to find a treatment and cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Standard registration
- FOP ACTION (Working name)
- FOP FRIENDS OF OLIVER (Working name)
- FOP ACTION (Previous name)
- FOP FRIENDS OF OLIVER (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF OLIVER (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF OLIVER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS BEDFORD-GAY | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Andrew Rankin | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bedford-Gay | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEAVER | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA WHITE | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ALMEIDA | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ACOSTA BEDFORD | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.34k | £179.76k | £245.25k | £231.41k | £83.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.47k | £136.21k | £162.75k | £141.36k | £58.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY FIBRODYSPLASIA OSSIFICANS PROGRESSIVA (FOP) A TRAGIC, DEGENERATIVE AND DEBILITATING CONDITION AND TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES. TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF FIBRODYSPLASIA OSSIFICANS PROGRESSIVA (FOP) AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE STUDY AND CURE OF FOP AND RELATED CONDITIONS. TO SUPPORT CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS UNDERTAKING CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN BOTH THE UK AND ABROAD WHO FUND RESEARCH, PROVIDE HELP, SUPPORT, CARE AND TREATMENT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY FOP AND RELATED CONDITIONS. TO SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS RESEARCHING TREATMENTS AND A CURE FOR FOP AND RELATED CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Cumberland Road
Sale
M33 3FR
- Phone:
- 01612820441
- Email:
- info@fopfriends.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window