Financial history GILLANI NOOR MASJID

Charity number: 1148726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £601.01k £163.30k £274.21k £224.84k £267.44k
Total expenditure £1.48m £229.84k £431.82k £446.24k £161.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.84k £37.21k £1.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £534.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £63.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £2.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £186.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £1.29m N/A N/A N/A N/A