GILLANI NOOR MASJID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a mosque (place of worship).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 28 August 2012: Standard registration
- GILLANI NOOR MOSQUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Farid Ayaz | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shafique Hussain | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faisal Shabir | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £601.01k | £163.30k | £274.21k | £224.84k | £267.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48m | £229.84k | £431.82k | £446.24k | £161.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.84k | £37.21k | £1.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £534.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £63.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £186.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.29m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 December 2022 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE AHLUS-SUNNAH-WAL-JAMA'AH HANFIA BRALVIA SCHOOL OF THOUGHT IN THE AREA OF LONGTON AND FENTON, STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE AREA SURROUNDING THE SAME, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY 2. ADVANCING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE UK 3. PROVIDING ISLAMIC TEACHING FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS 4. PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN RELATION TO THE ISLAMIC WAY OF LIFE 5. PROVIDING GUIDANCE ON SOCIAL ISSUES (MARRIAGE CEREMONIES AND FUNERALS ETC)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gillani Noor Mosque
2 Chaplin Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST3 4QS
- Phone:
- 07525049616
- Email:
- info@gillaninoormasjid.co.uk
- Website:
-
gillaninoormasjid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window