St Joseph's Convent Secondary School Ex Pupil's Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports a secondary school in Sierra Leone, that provides education for girls. The charity is made up of ex pupils of the school and this is one way of giving back. We have provided books, essential tables and chairs, replaced toilets and rewired buildings as examples. Currently, we are raising funds to re-roof a main building and construct extra classrooms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 23 November 2012: Standard registration
- CONVENT (Working name)
- St Joseph's Convent Secondary School Ex Pupil's Association (Previous name)
- ST. JOSEPH'S SECONDARY SCHOOL OLD GIRLS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akua Leigh-Williams | Chair | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Adenuga | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Nicolls | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lanza Wilson | Trustee | 31 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA FLOODE | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.51k | £15.64k | £22.00k | £20.14k | £46.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.17k | £10.90k | £43.91k | £13.92k | £31.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 May 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 23 FEB 2020 as amended on 25 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PRESENT PUPILS OF THE ST. JOSEPH’S SECONDARY SCHOOL IN SIERRA LEONE, BY THE PROVISION OF TEACHING AIDS, LABORATORY AND RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT, BOOKS, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, PROVISION OF CLASSROOMS, SCHOLARSHIPS AND EQUIPMENT NECESSARY TO ENHANCE EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Sycamore Road
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 2PH
- Phone:
- 07960746622
- Email:
- sjss_uk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window