Financial history THE AS YOU ARE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1147468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £53.37k £59.29k £93.02k £58.63k £100.51k
Total expenditure £64.89k £50.62k £73.21k £73.77k £65.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.00k N/A N/A N/A