THE AS YOU ARE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Low cost counselling and psychological support across East and West Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 May 2012: Standard registration
- AS YOU ARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOIRA THERESA MARY ELIZABETH BLISS | Chair | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Robert Holmes | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.37k | £59.29k | £93.02k | £58.63k | £100.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.89k | £50.62k | £73.21k | £73.77k | £65.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF VULNERABLE PERSONS INCLUDING PERSONS WITH MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 SOUTHWICK STREET
SOUTHWICK
WEST SUSSEX
BN42 4TH
- Phone:
- 01273871575
- Email:
- INFO@ASYOUARECENTRE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window