TORRIANO PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold fundraising events for the benefit of Torriano Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 22 June 2012: Standard registration
- TORRIANO INFANTS' PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Samantha Louise Hammond | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Walter | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bacharach | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2020 | 19/07/2021 | 19/07/2022 | 19/07/2023 | 19/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £24.56k | £24.99k | £17.66k | £34.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.72k | £20.61k | £19.75k | £11.77k | £39.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2021 | 23 June 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Torriano Primary School
Torriano Avenue
LONDON
NW5 2SJ
- Phone:
- 02074240202
- Email:
- torrianopta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window