Financial history Mercy Welfare Trust

Charity number: 1147907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £58.31k £86.68k £125.63k £120.39k £105.55k
Total expenditure £59.02k £342.66k £126.71k £113.67k £92.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A