Trustees LEDBURY ALLOTMENT ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity Number: 1147741

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoff Broadway | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ewelina Edyta Modiga | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Davies | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Oakshott-Francis | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Irving | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Gibson | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Grendel | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Elizabeth Anne Fountaine | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Celia Smith | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CARL ANTHONY JULIAN BARNES | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.