Financial history FACIAL PALSY UK

Charity Number: 1148115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £100.14k £163.17k £88.76k £276.90k £126.38k
Total expenditure £86.64k £69.63k £76.89k £103.86k £174.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.23k N/A N/A N/A