FACIAL PALSY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facial Palsy UK aims to: Provide information and support for people living with facial palsy and their families. Raise funds to sponsor research in the diagnosis and treatment of facial palsy. Provide information and training to health care professionals to improve equity of services throughout England and Wales. Represent the facial palsy community through advocacy services and lobbying.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
108 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fiona Philippa Tudor CBE | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Coles | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Parr | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Fox | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Pinsky | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Haynes | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Crowley | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jan Jutsum | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIONA HAWTHORNE | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES NDUKA | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.14k | £163.17k | £88.76k | £276.90k | £126.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.64k | £69.63k | £76.89k | £103.86k | £174.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2014 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING WITH FACIAL PALSY WHO ARE RESIDENT PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Facial Palsy UK
Eventus
Sunderland Road
Market Deeping
Peterborough
- Phone:
- 03000309333
- Email:
- info@facialpalsy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window