Financial history FRIENDS OF COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 502879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.75k £15.06k £2.69k £7.86k £7.00k
Total expenditure £23.15k £13.20k £2.35k £8.63k £7.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A