THE ADRIAN BUCKLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We built an orphanage in Uganda, and donations to the Princes Trust and forget me not Children's Hospice. See Annual Report and Accounts for details as fully explained there.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
- Uganda
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- 08 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.17k | £7.50k | £0 | £9.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.68k | £4.06k | £0 | £13.09k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 29 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND THE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window