Financial history BUCKMINSTER VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.14k £689 £2.15k £2.15k £2.97k
Total expenditure £3.31k £2.15k £6.44k £8.79k £4.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A