THE PLAYERS FOUNDATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of beneficiaries. To promote good health amongst beneficiaries. The relief of such beneficiaries and their dependants who are in conditions of need, hardship, and distress and find themselves in necessitous circumstances. To support and promote community participation and healthy recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,490,247
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.46m | |
Other | £27.73k |
Total expenditure:
£967,512
Raising funds | £382.11k | |
Charitable activities | £585.40k | |
Other | £0 |
£3,414,702 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £382.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £585.40k | |
Retained for future use | £522.74k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £382.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £585.40k | |
Retained for future use | £3.94m |
People

3 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- THE PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS' ASSOCIATION CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Walters | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Prothero | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARETH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Brendon Batson OBE | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARTH CROOKS | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.46m | £13.09m | £1.36m | £1.19m | £1.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.70m | £19.58m | £8.92m | £266.52k | £967.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £216.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £18.00m | £11.76m | £239.02k | £18.01k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £268.34k | £200.74k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.13m | £1.13m | £978.76k | £1.14m | £1.46m | |
|
Income - Other | £62.97k | £5.12k | £142.26k | £24.80k | £27.73k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £19.97m | £17.92m | £8.71m | -£12.51k | £585.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.73m | £1.66m | £207.45k | £279.02k | £382.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £251.40k | £3.02m | £115.74k | £238.68k | £182.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £8.08m | £7.39m | £5.83m | -£583.85k | £53.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £272.46k | £204.30k | £207.45k | £220.57k | £314.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £19.27m | £19.13m | £9.67m | £1.82m | £1.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | £27.49m | £31.58m | £35.06m | £47.30m | £54.16m | |
|
Other assets | £19.13m | £12.52m | £4.87m | £3.91m | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.99m | £4.32m | £3.39m | £1.81m | £1.84m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 16 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUN 2021 as amended on 16 Jun 2022 as amended on 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING. 1.2. IN ARTICLES 1.3.1 TO 1.3.3 INCLUSIVE, “BENEFICIARIES” HAS THE FOLLOWING MEANING: 1.2.1. TRAINEE PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS; 1.2.2. YOUNG PERSONS REGISTERED WITH PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALL ACADEMIES ASSOCIATED WITH A CLUB OR CENTRES OF EXCELLENCE ASSOCIATED WITH A CLUB WISHING TO PURSUE A CAREER AS A PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLER; 1.2.3. FORMER TRAINEE PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS; 1.2.4. PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS; AND 1.2.5. FORMER PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS. IN ALL CASES IN THIS DEFINITION PERSONS SHALL PLAY OR HAVE PLAYED OR TRAINED WITH A CLUB IN THE ENGLISH PREMIER LEAGUE AND OR FOOTBALL LEAGUE OR ANY SUCCESSOR COMPETITION. 1.3. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES: 1.3.1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING IN PARTICULAR BY UNDERTAKING EDUCATION BY VOCATIONAL TRAINING SO AS TO EQUIP THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE ENABLING THEM TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT ONCE THEIR CAREERS AS PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS HAVE CEASED, AND FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THIS INCLUDES THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE WISHING TO BECOME PROFESSIONAL FOOTBALLERS; 1.3.2. TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONGST BENEFICIARIES; 1.3.3. THE RELIEF OF SUCH BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND FIND THEMSELVES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES; FOR THE REMAINDER OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY THE BENEFICIARIES SHALL BE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE: 1.3.4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF HISTORY, THE DEVELOPMENT AND SOCIAL IMPACT UPON ENGLISH NATIONAL LIFE OF THE GAME OF FOOTBALL, INCLUDING ACTIVITIES SUCH AS THE PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY OF ARTEFACTS AND MEMORABILIA OF EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORIC VALUE; 1.3.5. TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION AND HEALTHY RECREATION (INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH, INCLUDING PROVISION TO ADDRESS DRUG ADDICTION OR ADDICTION OF ANY KIND; 1.3.6. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE A NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 1.3.7 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE “SOCIALLY EXCLUDED” MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE USE OR DEPENDENCY, INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP OR FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OR CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); AND 1.3.8 THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (KNOWN AS THE TRUSTEES) SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Nicholas Street
CHESTER
CH1 2NX
- Phone:
- 07971 827344
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window