HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harper Adams University delivers higher education in support of the agricultural, agricultural engineering, food science and technology, environmental science, veterinary science and land-based sectors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£51,775,000
Donations and legacies | £566.00k | |
Charitable activities | £11.19m | |
Other trading activities | £39.61m | |
Investments | £406.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£50,236,000
Raising funds | £296.15k | |
Charitable activities | £49.94m | |
Other | £0 |
£85,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,340,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £296.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £49.94m | |
Retained for future use | £1.54m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £296.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £49.94m | |
Retained for future use | £1.62m |
People

475 Employee(s)
20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 27 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Standard registration
- HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY COLLEGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Wong | Chair | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||
William Penri Evans | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Navaratnam Patheeban | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Douglas | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamanna Jitesh | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine Ennew | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Allden | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Klages | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Barbara Ama Ansah Panfu Bray | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Ken Sloan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ben Shipston | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Liz Salter | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Uloma Uhunmwangho | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr John Reade | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Talib Sheikh | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foster Griffiths | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Hawkins | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Tim Watson | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Deborah Jane Hewett | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
REBECCA PAYNE | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.19m | £41.20m | £41.90m | £45.49m | £51.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.11m | £42.35m | £41.72m | £46.33m | £50.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.03m | £9.46m | £9.93m | £11.86m | £14.34m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.59m | £497.00k | £1.04m | £456.00k | £566.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.70m | £8.63m | £8.17m | £35.57m | £39.61m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £32.84m | £31.98m | £32.68m | £9.45m | £11.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £1.04m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £57.00k | £105.00k | £12.00k | £16.00k | £406.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £42.78m | £41.85m | £41.24m | £45.95m | £49.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £326.00k | £499.86k | £473.41k | £373.76k | £296.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £159.00k | £149.17k | £90.16k | £111.56k | £379.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £88.95m | £92.45m | £91.48m | £89.52m | £88.11m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.03m | £943.00k | £1.09m | £1.11m | £1.09m | |
|
Other assets | £19.02m | £16.90m | £20.80m | £37.68m | £42.02m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£21.81m | -£31.39m | -£32.51m | -£13.93m | -£494.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £31.66m | £31.99m | £32.79m | £46.04m | £46.58m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/01/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE UNIVERSITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION, CONDUCT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY TO PROVIDE HIGHER EDUCATION FOR THE INDUSTRIES, PROFESSIONS AND COMMUNITIES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LAND.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harper Adams University
Edgmond
NEWPORT
TF10 8NB
- Phone:
- 01952820280
- Email:
- cbaxter@harper-adams.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window