ELLINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To disburse community funds received from Wandylaw Wind Farm within Ellingham Parish, Northumberland. Funding is used improve communications through broadband and transport. These are both aspects to do with preventing isolation and rural poverty. The other areas of very high priority from a local survey were sustainability with renewable energies and improving the thermal comfort of homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 02 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Charles Edmondson | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison Thompson | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JEAN FRIER | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Metcalfe | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judy Glover | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louis Michael Rudston Fell | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|||||
GEORGE ROBERT UNWIN | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.99k | £48.31k | £50.89k | £57.88k | £65.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.93k | £40.96k | £40.57k | £76.60k | £103.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROCKTHORPE CONSULTANCY
BROCKDAM FARM
ELLINGHAM
CHATHILL
NE67 5HN
- Phone:
- 07770255639
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window