CHILDREN OF CONGO FOUNDATION (CCF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children of Congo Foundation is organization which support children in primary and secondary school. Children of Congo has been created to financially support children education in different part of DRC. The organisation design and deliver programmes which ensure that children's educational rights are met. CCF empower and support existing local organizations which support children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 23 August 2012: Standard registration
- CHILDREN OF CONGO, (CCF) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYDIE BUNGUDI LUKOMBO | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christian Kumu Kende | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADONIS MAGEMA | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/01/2020 | 09/01/2021 | 09/01/2022 | 09/01/2023 | 09/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £86 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £86 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 January 2024 | 23 December 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 January 2021 | 19 October 2022 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 January 2020 | 19 October 2022 | 709 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/02/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN OF THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO (DRC) AND CHILDREN OF CONGOLESE PARENTAGE WHO ARE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE TRUSTEES WILL FURTHER THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: (A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES; (D) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE EXISTING LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO ANY NEW PURPOSES WHICH ARE SUBSEQUENTLY RECOGNISED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Leeds Street
LONDON
N18 2AB
- Phone:
- 07950182716
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window