Financial history BRIDGE COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1148902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13 £1.01k £5.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £13 £13 £4.76k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A