LIGHTHOUSE MINISTRIES UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lead tenant of a Community Centre, available for local groups who serve residents of the local area. We are a Christian group who use gifts to our para church activities to ensure that the centre can be provided at a low charge to encourage its use in a deprived area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 August 2013: Standard registration
- 12 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/08/2013
Charitable objects
31. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE ONE. 3.2 (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROOSEGATE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.2 (II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. PLEASE ENSURE THAT THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS ENTERED AT CLAUSE 2(I) ABOVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window