Accounts and annual returns PURBECK ISLE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1148703
Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days
Annual return 24 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days
Annual return 24 May 2022 17 May 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2021 17 May 2023 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2020 28 April 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2020 Not Required