Financial history COMMUNITIES FIRST WESSEX

Charity number: 1147527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.46m £3.36m £3.32m £3.35m £3.72m
Total expenditure £2.69m £2.86m £3.11m £3.26m £3.70m
Income from government contracts £972.36k £1.12m £1.14m £1.23m £1.14m
Income from government grants £750.39k £1.23m £1.25m £1.25m £1.43m
Income - Donations and legacies £39.39k £473.66k £118.55k £33.38k £143.95k
Income - Other trading activities £37.74k £25.26k £19.82k £22.41k £16.44k
Income - Charitable activities £2.38m £2.86m £3.19m £3.29m £3.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.26k £1.49k £95 £2.40k £10.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.69m £2.86m £3.11m £3.26m £3.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.55k £24.33k £15.80k £0 £18.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £220.51k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0