Governance COMMUNITIES FIRST WESSEX
Charity number: 1147527

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 30 May 2012: Standard registration
- 14 January 2014: Funds received from 1054498 COMMUNITY FIRST EAST HAMPSHIRE
- 05 June 2014: Funds received from 229351-1 COMMUNITY EMERGENCY FUND
- 05 June 2014: Funds received from 229351 HAVANT COUNCIL OF COMMUNITY SERVICE
- 23 September 2021: Funds received from 900509 BASINGSTOKE RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE CRISIS CENTRE
- 24 May 2022: Funds received from 1068964 COMMUNITY FIRST NEW FOREST
- 07 July 2023: Funds received from 1148418 ITS YOUR CHOICE LIMITED
- 13 February 2024: Funds received from 1015680 WHEELS FOR FREEDOM
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- COMMUNITY FIRST HEH (Working name)
- HCCS COMMUNITY ACTION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.