Trustees COMMUNITIES FIRST WESSEX
Charity number: 1147527

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Tiller | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Kevin Reeves | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Ruth Pepper | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Owain Thomas Little | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Savage | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ap Kenneth Mortimore | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Nerys Carter | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Wendy Pullin | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lefley | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Frederick Kirkland | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Graham | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.