THE WHOMERLEY SPIRITUAL CHURCH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Spiritualist Church . Holding divine services on a Sunday, Healing services on a Tuesday. Demonstration of communication with Spirit on a monthly Saturday evening. Workshops etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Myers | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Wastell | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BRECHT | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY PARKINS | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PARKINS | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £4.30k | £10.39k | £10.59k | £10.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £4.65k | £6.12k | £9.83k | £10.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUALIST RELIGION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.1 PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OF SPIRITUAL WORSHIP IN OR NEAR THE TOWN OF STEVENAGE IN HERTFORDSHIRE. 2.2 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE RELIGION, SCIENCE AND PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM THROUGH DEVELOPMENT OF THE SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL, MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL ASPECTS OF LIFE. THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM, ARE:- 1) THE FATHERHOOD OF GOD. 2)THE BROTHERHOOD OF MAN. 3)COMMUNION OF SPIRITS AND THE MINISTRY OF ANGELS. 4)THE CONTINUOUS EXISTENCE OF THE HUMAN SOUL. 5)PERSONAL RESPONSIBILTY. 6)COMPENSATION AND RETRIBUTION HEREAFTER FOR ALL THE GOOD AND EVIL DEEDS DONE ON EARTH. 7)ETERNAL PROGRESS OPEN TO EVERY HUMAN SOUL. 2.3 TO SERVE THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING, ADMINISTERED THROUGH PRAYER, OR BY THE LAYING-ON OF HANDS, FOR THE HEALING OF SPIRIT, MIND AND BODY, AND INCLUDING SUCH ALLIED COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES AS HAVE A SPIRITUAL BASIS. 2.4 THAT THE CENTRE BE USED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR OTHER EVENTS DEEMED TO BE COMPATIBLE WITH 2.2 ABOVE AND AGREED TO BY THE CURRENT COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE IN HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
288 Chertsey Rise
Stevenage
SG2 9JF
- Phone:
- 01438236754
- Email:
- william.parkins@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window