CHRISTIAN KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing food to homeless and marginalised people in London E17.We do this using a purpose built soup van,seven days a week using volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 21 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Carter | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Tawiah | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Baptiste | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethelhem Tedela | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria De La Cruz Martinez Servan | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Austrie | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mumtaz Khalick | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paige Singh | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Kearns | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lock | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
David Frederick Williams | Trustee | 18 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN PHILIP COE | Trustee | 17 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.80k | £144.18k | £41.51k | £27.28k | £48.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.36k | £58.22k | £33.81k | £42.93k | £32.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.50k | £5.60k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN WALTHAM FOREST BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
208 HAINAULT ROAD
LONDON
E11 1EP
- Phone:
- 07379684016
- Email:
- info@christiankitchen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window