Financial history FAITH AND LIFE

Charity number: 1149974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £26.27k £25.59k £42.00k £96.55k £128.39k
Total expenditure £24.04k £24.08k £38.00k £87.06k £116.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A