EAST END COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant making charity working to relieve poverty in four boroughs of East London; Tower Hamlets, Hackney, Newham and the City of London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,057,803
Donations and legacies | £1.08m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £10.00k | |
Investments | £965.42k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,921,937
Raising funds | £345.01k | |
Charitable activities | £1.58m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,615,079 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £66,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £345.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.58m | |
Retained for future use | £135.87k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £345.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.58m | |
Retained for future use | £2.75m |
People

12 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
152 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 21 June 2012: Standard registration
- 27 October 2016: Funds received from 802942 ISLE OF DOGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- 13 February 2017: Funds received from 274924 THE EDGAR PRIZE
- 14 February 2017: Funds received from 312959 THE STANLEY CARR SCRIPTURE PRIZES
- 14 February 2017: Funds received from 312200 GEORGE RAINEY FUND
- EECF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Timothy Musgrave | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine McGuinness | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Everitt | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alkhad Ali | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alderman Bronislaw Masojada | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Atanu Bhattacherjee | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jim MacHale | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Stuart Fraser | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sahidur Rahman | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rick Watson | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Guy Nicholson | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Webster | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50m | £4.83m | £2.48m | £2.50m | £2.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.39m | £4.17m | £2.35m | £2.56m | £1.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £320.00k | £810.35k | £689.53k | £66.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | £17.70k | £5.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.73m | £4.12m | £1.78m | £1.66m | £1.08m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £27.70k | £22.85k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £753.54k | £683.66k | £671.70k | £811.57k | £965.42k | |
|
Income - Other | £15.02k | £22.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.05m | £3.77m | £1.98m | £2.16m | £1.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £339.89k | £396.59k | £366.76k | £397.50k | £345.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.72k | £78.20k | £104.68k | £99.56k | £85.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.83m | £3.15m | £1.67m | £1.88m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £44.47k | £0 | £69.65k | £58.54k | £189.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.32m | £26.19m | £2.33m | £3.06m | £3.33m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.65m | £0 | £26.47m | £25.63m | £28.30m | |
|
Other assets | £1.50m | £1.91m | £1.71m | £842.77k | £707.77k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £200.42k | £380.29k | £527.97k | £453.09k | £511.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN THE BENEFIT AREA; THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR INHABITANTS WITHIN THE BENEFIT AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION IN LIFE; THE PROMOTION OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING (INCLUDING TRAINING IN EMPLOYMENT SKILLS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS WITHIN THE BENEFIT AREA; THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OR OF AN APPRECIABLY IMPORTANT CLASS OF THE COMMUNITY CONSISTING OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE BENEFIT AREA; THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE BENEFIT AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE BENEFIT AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (B) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (C) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; AND (D) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES OR CORPORATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME IN EXISTENCE HAVING AS, OR AMONG, THEIR OBJECTS ANY SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THE COMPANY; AND TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER ACTS AND THINGS AS THE BOARD MAY (SUBJECT TO THE ARTICLES) CONSIDER NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OR PROMOTION OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SET OUT IN ARTICLE 3.1; PROVIDED THAT NONE OF THE OBJECTS MAY BE EXERCISED IN SUCH A WAY AS TO ACHIEVE OR PROMOTE AIMS AND/OR OBJECTIVES OF A PARTY POLITICAL NATURE; AND PROVIDED THAT IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE POWER TO PROMOTE ANY OF THE OBJECTS AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN AREAS AND/OR PLACES OUTSIDE THE BENEFIT AREA WHERE IT IS OF THE OPINION THAT TO DO SO WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JACK DASH HOUSE
2 LAWN HOUSE CLOSE
LONDON
E14 9YQ
- Phone:
- 02073454444
- Email:
- admin@eastendcf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window