THE GENESIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants and social investments to help communities within developing countries improve their standards of living. Our funding will assist in providing training, equipment and other support towards sustainable, long-term income generation and self-sufficiency, with a particular emphasis on marginalised communities currently beyond the reach of government or market-based solutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£696,376
Donations and legacies | £684.61k | |
Charitable activities | £5.92k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.59k | |
Other | £250 |
Total expenditure:
£1,022,792
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£16,716 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.02m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of Westminster
- Argentina
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Chile
- Colombia
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Nigeria
- Peru
- Philippines
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Vietnam
Governance
- 20 August 2012: Standard registration
- GenEM Foundation (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Roydon | Chair | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chris Ellyatt | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martina Jersakova | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Xing Hu | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mario Solari | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Simon Mather | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £816.69k | £1.56m | £924.43k | £889.08k | £696.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25m | £1.92m | £930.16k | £665.20k | £1.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £810.02k | £1.56m | £924.43k | £884.65k | £684.61k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.92k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.66k | £1.06k | £42 | £1.46k | £5.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.96k | £250 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £1.92m | £930.16k | £665.20k | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.54k | £4.83k | £2.13k | £2.87k | £13.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.14m | £1.82m | £828.03k | £528.96k | £846.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £214.60k | £246.22k | £229.54k | £686.83k | £1.02m | |
|
Other assets | £1.99m | £1.77m | £1.65m | £1.98m | £1.68m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £173.00k | £305.80k | £460.05k | £257.10k | £564.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/08/2012 as amended on 23 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROJECTS, AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME, ACHIEVE ECONOMIC GROWTH AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. SUSTAINABLE INCOME MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 St James's Street
LONDON
London
London
SW1A 1ER
- Phone:
- 02072017200
- Email:
- admin@genemfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window