CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH INTERNATIONAL(MOUNT ZION)U.K

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer range of services during the week that the community and the entire public find both physically and spiritually beneficial. The church provided counselling and other related services to benefit the families and the community including Sunday School lessons. We organised seminars, symposia and conferences during the year to train the church volunteers and the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Ghana
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 October 2012: Standard registration
- CAC-MOUNT ZION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DANIEL DANSO | Chair | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SELORM AMUZU | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSIE TSEKPO | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER NATHAN ODEI B.ED | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE ACHEAMPONG | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.53k | £130.11k | £87.07k | £142.77k | £164.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.33k | £112.76k | £70.85k | £96.46k | £153.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/2012
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AFRICA AND UNITED KINGDOM. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN AFRICA AND UNITED KINGDOM BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN AFRICA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 PARKFIELD ROAD
FELTHAM
TW13 7LQ
- Phone:
- 07882796278
- Email:
- trustee.sec@cacfeltham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window