Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - COMFORT HAVEN

Charity number: 1147875
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 June 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 18 May 2023 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 March 2022 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required