UPLANDS ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UET is a Swindon based charity who's aim is to enable young people, regardless of their special educational needs, to shape their own future and contribute to their community; breaking down barriers towards disabled young people through meaningful community inclusion. Our mission is to create living and working opportunities, enable meaningful lives and support families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,352,217
Donations and legacies | £39.45k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other trading activities | £8.60k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,306,462
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.14m | |
Other | £165.45k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,304,174 from 6 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £165.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.14m | |
Retained for future use | £45.76k |
People

54 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2012: Standard registration
- 19 December 2022: Funds received from 1087034 CLIVEY AND TWIST
- UPLANDS EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK ALAN DINSEY | Chair | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Philip Helme | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Stone | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sims | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dinsey | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Smith | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANITA FIELDWICK MBE | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35m | £797.81k | £982.77k | £1.29m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13m | £980.98k | £969.20k | £1.16m | £1.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £574.22k | £904.24k | £362.45k | £1.30m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.63m | £103.48k | £14.03k | £28.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £93.73k | £19.04k | £1.87k | £66.69k | £39.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £132.65k | £0 | £0 | £8.62k | £8.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.09m | £778.77k | £979.96k | £1.21m | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £28.58k | £0 | £940 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.12m | £980.98k | £969.20k | £1.16m | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.33k | £0 | £0 | £175 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.46k | £0 | £4.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £165.45k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £324.05k | £85.83k | £73.38k | £111.56k | £115.37k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £557.42k | £357.84k | £283.22k | £436.66k | £452.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£147.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £318.03k | £210.40k | £109.76k | £174.02k | £148.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2012 as amended on 30 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY DEVELOPING, MANAGING AND PROVIDING, EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH THIRD PARTIES, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PUPILS AT UPLANDS SCHOOL IN SWINDON (OR ANY SUCCESSOR SCHOOL TO IT); (2) PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (3) TO ADVANCE HEALTH AND RELIEVE DISABILITY BY IMPROVING THE MORALE, CONFIDENCE, WELL-BEING, SKILLS AND ABILITIES OF THOSE DEEMED VULNERABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uplands Enterprise Trust Learning Centre
Stratton Road
SWINDON
SN1 2PN
- Phone:
- 01793 286620
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window