HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY GRIMSBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society promotes Hindu culture and celebrates Hindu festivals whilst bringing together the whole Community in the area to promote better understanding and integration. Also studying of the Hindu scriptures, history, literature, Indian classical dances, Mindfulness and Yoga.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 June 2012: Standard registration
- 14 May 2014: Funds received from 1085067 HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY GRIMSBY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Annapurna Kumar | Chair | 22 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anupam Sinha | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramadevi Vedutla | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dinobandhu Sarkar | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sisir Majumdar | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2019 | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.26k | £10.08k | £18.95k | £7.27k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.13k | £12.33k | £9.01k | £7.96k | £13.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days | |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCING THE HINDU RELIGION CULTURE AND DOCTRINES B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION IN THE HINDU TRADITION HISTORY LANGUAGE LITERATURE AND MUSIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
86-88 Cleethorpes Road
Grimsby
DN31 3EH
- Phone:
- 01472 277967
- Email:
- HCSEXEC@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window