JEWISH RADIO LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within this year we were involved in getting charitable status, and finding donors to set up the radio station. A substantial pledge has been received but we do not yet have the required funding to start operating.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
- 09 November 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £516 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | 23 July 2014 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2012
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION; B) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window