RISE AFRICA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rise Africa UK supports projects in Tanzania that: a) develop young people?s skills to enable them to participate in society as independent and responsible individuals; making them more employable and increase their standard of living b) advance education through sponsorship, free education, after-school classes, training programs and the offering of recourses to ill-equipped schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Bedford
- Lambeth
- Tanzania
Governance
- 29 August 2012: Standard registration
- GOLDEN ACTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVIA de Villiers | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Phillips | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ATHERTON | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FAULKNER | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA KENYON | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.20k | £49.73k | £83.00k | £81.48k | £81.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.39k | £52.84k | £41.52k | £95.31k | £95.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/08/2012 as amended on 01 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN TANZANIA THROUGH SUPPORTING PROJECTS IN TANZANIA THAT: (A) DEVELOP YOUNG PEOPLES SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; MAKING THEM MORE EMPLOYABLE AND INCREASE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING IN THE FUTURE. (B) ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH SPONSORSHIP, FREE EDUCATION, AFTER-SCHOOL CLASSES, TRAINING PROGRAMS AND THE OFFERING OF RESOURSES TO ILL-EQUIPPED SCHOOLS. (C) RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN TANZANIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. (D) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Chapel House
Riseley Road
Keysoe
Bedford
MK44 2HT
- Phone:
- 01234708656
- Email:
- info@rise-africa.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window