GIVE A CHANCE TO ALL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty and distress and the advancement of education amongst children in need in the UK and elsewhere Relief of anyone who may have been the victim of the human trafficking trade, and to relieve the suffering of the victims in particular but not exclusively by providing practical support and assistance via partner organisations and raising awareness of human trafficking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERRY O'KELLO | Chair | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE OSWE | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
KIRAN PADIA | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
AGNES OLUBAJO | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHONA DUFF | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/08/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN IN NEED IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR THOSE ATTENDING ST. JUDE’S JUNIOR SCHOOL IN PALLISA, EASTERN UGANDA. 2. THE RELIEF OF ANYONE WHO MAY HAVE BEEN THE VICTIM OF THE HUMAN TRAFFICKING TRADE, AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THE VICTIMS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I) PROVIDING PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE VIA PARTNER ORGANISATIONS. II) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING IN PARTICULAR THE CONSEQUENCES FOR, AND NEEDS OF, VICTIMS. 3. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 CHARTERIS ROAD
LONDON
N4 3AB
- Phone:
- 07956321929
- Email:
- giveachancetoall@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window