Accounts and annual returns PETERBOROUGH ATHLETIC CLUB
Charity number: 1149999
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 August 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 August 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 20 August 2020 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 30 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 11 August 2018 | 12 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window