HONOR FROST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147921
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Foundation's mission is to promote the advancement and research, including publication, of marine and maritime archaeology with particular but not exclusive focus on the Eastern Mediterranean with an emphasis on Lebanon, Syria and Cyprus. The Foundation also supports safeguarding and promoting the protection of underwater cultural heritage (UCH).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Southampton City
  • Australia
  • Cyprus
  • Egypt
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Lebanon
  • Malta
  • Mexico
  • Spain
  • Syria
  • Turkey
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2012: Standard registration
  • 12 September 2017: Funds received from 1140870 HONOR FROST CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HFF (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON JULIA BEWLEY CATHIE Chair 29 June 2012
None on record
Paola Alagna Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
PETER MARSHALL WOLRICH Trustee 29 June 2012
None on record
Dr CLAUDE DOUMET-SERHAL CBE Trustee 29 June 2012
None on record
Dr VENETIA ANN PORTER Trustee 29 June 2012
None on record
ROGER JACKSON CLARK FCA Trustee 29 June 2012
THE OFENHEIM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TWO R'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HAWTHORNE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTHERN THAILAND ELEPHANT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr JOHN EDWARD CURTIS OBE, FBA Trustee 29 June 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £861.50k £710.18k £682.26k £726.29k £956.92k
Total expenditure £1.39m £893.41k £1.58m £3.07m £2.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £860.16k £708.63k £681.06k £726.18k £955.64k
Income - Other £1.34k £1.56k £1.20k £105 £1.28k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £705.93k £1.38m £2.76m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £222.99k £187.48k £203.19k £310.01k £211.28k
Expenditure - Governance £89.89k £66.93k £75.90k £89.18k £119.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £453.36k £319.57k £683.74k £1.40m £828.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £222.99k £187.48k £203.19k £310.01k £211.28k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £42.91m £41.58m £46.49m £42.42m £43.04m
Other assets £476.21k £314.66k £373.76k £224.83k £324.56k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.67m £1.38m £1.78m £2.87m £3.25m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 August 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 09 August 2024 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 10 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 CARLTON HOUSE TERRACE
LONDON
SW1Y 5AH
Phone:
02079695223