Accounts and annual returns THE WIRE GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1148992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 27 July 2024 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 27 July 2024 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 May 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 May 2021 76 days late Download Open in new window